This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2015 at 15:25:07 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION VS. URSULA N. CATO

Case Summary

On 08/21/2007 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against URSULA N CATO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSE HOM, LAW & MOTION and RANDALL PACHECO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0923

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSE HOM

LAW & MOTION

RANDALL PACHECO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIT GROUP CONSUMER FINANCE INC.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Defendants

BEJUNE KATHY

CATO URSULA N.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

GOODYEAR HOME LOAN CO.

JENKINS JOHN JACOB (ROE 51)

KEVORKIAN ARMEN

MARTIN ABRAM E.

MONTELONGO LISA

ROES 51 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

SKYVIEW ESCROW INC.

SMITH MARK

SMITH MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNYDER LAW

Defendant Attorneys

POWELL ALEX LAW OFFICES OF .

SANJAR HASTTIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION WITH CONSENT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT OSC TO DISMISSAL ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2007
  • DocketAmended Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP 405.050] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketSummons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP 405.050] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • DocketAcknowlgmt of Receipt (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • DocketComplaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CIT GROUP/CONSUMER FINANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANJAR HASTTIE