This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2020 at 07:08:55 (UTC).

MONTELEONE NTERIORS INC. VS JOSE MONCADA

Case Summary

On 04/18/2007 MONTELEONE NTERIORS INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JOSE MONCADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STANLEY WEISBERG, MICHAEL R. HOFF and PATRICIA M. SCHNEGG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7701

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2007

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STANLEY WEISBERG

MICHAEL R. HOFF

PATRICIA M. SCHNEGG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC.

Defendants

ALL BRIGHT WINDOW COVERINGS

DOES 1-100

ELISIO'S ROOFING AND REPAIR

KAPE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

KORNLAND BUILDINGS

LEE MICHAEL

MONCADA JOSE

MONTEL OSCAR

RESTORE-IT

SIBRIAN ELISIO

COVERINGS ALL BRIGHT WINDOW

Cross Defendants

AVM WOODWORKING INC

BELTRAN FRANCISCO

LEE HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YELSKY JEROME ALLAN

Defendant Attorney

RUBANOWITZ SHALOM .

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Jury Trial (Trial-Jury; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference (Conference-Final Status; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Status Conference (Conference-Status; Order-Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department D; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • DocketAssociation of Counsel; Filed by FRANCISCO BELTRAN (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2007
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • DocketAnswer-Amended; Filed by KAPE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (Defendant); KORNLAND BUILDINGS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • DocketComplaint-Cross-1st Amended; Filed by KAPE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (Defendant); KORNLAND BUILDINGS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department D; (Motion-Nunc Pro Tunc Order; Order-Nunc Pro Tunc) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department D; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2007
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVM WOODWORKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAPE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC. DBA MONTELEONE INTERIORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KORNLAND BUILDING A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant