This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 11:32:15 (UTC).

MICHAEL & SUSAN LEVINE VS CHRISTINE LONDON LTD

Case Summary

On 12/28/2000 MICHAEL SUSAN LEVINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTINE LONDON LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY ANN MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2480

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY ANN MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LEVINE MICHAEL

LEVINE SUSAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHRISTINE LONDON LTD.

LONDON CHRISTINE

Defendant and Respondent

LONDON CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HILL FARRER & BURRILL LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BRULL PICCIONELLI SARNO BRAUN & VRADENBUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2001
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2001
  • DocketNotice (of taking dates off calendar ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2001
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2001
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (entire action, with prejudice ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • Docketat 03:30 pm in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Motion for an Order - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • DocketStipulation (STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS TO BE PRODUCED BY PIERRE SPRINKLER & LANDSCAPING, INC. AND ORDER THEREON ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURETO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE;) - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2001
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2001
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2001
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2001
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed (INITIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2001
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2001
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2001
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2000
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTINE LONDON LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant