This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 22:31:54 (UTC).

MATTHEW PHILLIPS VS ELECTRONICS BOUTIQUE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2006 MATTHEW PHILLIPS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ELECTRONICS BOUTIQUE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE and ROY L. PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1688

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

ROY L. PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIPS MATTHEW

Defendants

AMS AMERICA INC

BECK TODD A.

GAMESTOP INC.

UDAIL DAVID

GAMES EB

HAGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

BAYVIEW BUILDERS INC

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

TRI-PACIFIC HEATING INC

Cross Defendants

BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

COLUMBIA REGENCY RETAIL PARTNERS LLC

REGENCY CENTERS CORPORATION

Intervenor

AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

HAGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKE

SMITH & SUSSON LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Intervenor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (Cross-Defendant); HAGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (Cross-Defendant); HAGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • DocketOrder; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AMS AMERICA INC (Defendant); HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2006
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TODD A. BECK (Defendant); TRI-PACIFIC HEATING INC (Legacy Party); AMS AMERICA INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MATTHEW PHILLIPS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/1970
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Intervenor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HAIGHT BROWN & BONSTEEL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LAW OFFICES OF is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant