This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2015 at 23:41:40 (UTC).

MARTHA KARSH ET. AL. VS. FORT HILL CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 09/09/2005 MARTHA KARSH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORT HILL CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA L. COLLINS, PETER D. LICHTMAN, VALERIE BAKER, CAROLYN B. KUHL, LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ and JOE W. HILBERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6901

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA L. COLLINS

PETER D. LICHTMAN

VALERIE BAKER

CAROLYN B. KUHL

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

JOE W. HILBERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARSH BRUCE

KARSH MARTHA

Defendants

ALLEGED ALTER EGO

BONDED ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION INC.

BONDED ELECTRIC INC.

BROADWAY AIR CONDITIONING HEATING SHEET

CAST PRODUCT INSTALLATION INC. [ROE 101]

CHRISTINE LONDON LTD.

CORBETT CUSTOM INTERIORS INC.

COVELLO PLASTERING CORPORATION

DEWAN GEOFFREY

DMC PLUMBING

DORMAN DENNIS

DPC WOODWORK INC.

FERGUSON SHAMAMIAN & RATTNER ARCHITECTS

FORT HILL ASSOCIATES

FORT HILL CONSTRUCTION

GIVEN + GORMALLY ARCHITECTS

GROVER HOLLINGSWORTH AND ASSOCIATES INC.

HEIDI CORPORATION

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN & LORD APC

Defendant Attorneys

BONETATI KINCAID & KINCAID INC.

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

CHRIS DANIELS LAW OFFICES OF

DONNER FERNANDEZ & LAUBY LLP

GREENBERG GLUSKER FIELDS ET AL.

JEFFERY & GROSFELD

KEVIN PEGAN LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS

MORROW & WHITE

NORTHUO & SCHLUETER

REED SMITH LLP

SCOUTON & SCOUTON LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Request for copies by Janey & Janey $134.00 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2008
  • Declaration (OF SERVICE OF CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Issued notice to bookkeeper on 3-21-08 to transfer $150.00 jury fees deposited on sm4744108012 to juryfee. (GM) ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other ( Issued notice to bookkeeper on 3-21-08 to transfer $150.00 jury fees deposited on sm485746011 to juryfee. (GM) ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • Request for Dismissal (w/ prej. ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION INCLUDING ANY AND ALL DEEMED CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • Report-Status (plaintiff's report re settlement status and request for continuance of OSC re dismissal ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
737 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2005
  • Reply To Motion (DEFT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • Reply To Motion (DEFT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2005
  • Opposition (PLFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY DEFT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2005
  • Opposition (TO DEFT'S MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF THE COMPLT; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • Demurrer (BY DEFENDANT FORT HILL CONSTRUCT- ION; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2005
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2005
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTINE LONDON LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COVELLO PLASTERING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DPC WOODWORK INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEIDI CORPORATION is a litigant