This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 06:18:58 (UTC).

MARSHAL CASTLE VS JAMES A GORTON

Case Summary

On 12/13/2002 MARSHAL CASTLE filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JAMES A GORTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD A. FERNS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7024

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD A. FERNS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTLE MARSHAL

Defendants and Respondents

GORTON JAMES A.

GORTON JANOSIK & POXON LLP

KIM MICHAEL

VALENCIA DENTAL CARE

WYND-MAR-K LLC

WYNDHAMSMITH DAVID

WYNDHAMSMITH PATRICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VAN DYKE KEITH

TURNER FREDERICK E. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

RIVERA CLARK

GIBSON RIVERA & TOMS LLP

WYNDHAMSMITH & KIM A PROF. DENTAL CORP.

RIVERA CLARK LAW OFFICES OF

COMPEAN EFREN A. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
291 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by James A. Gorton (Defendant); Gorton, Janosik & Poxon LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2002
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2002
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marshal Castle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIVERA CLARK WALTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COMPEAN EFREN ANTHONY