This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 17:06:04 (UTC).

MARIA LEMUS, VS SAV-ON DRUGS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/12/2006 MARIA LEMUS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAV-ON DRUGS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOIS A. SMALTZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3866

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOIS A. SMALTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMUS MARIA

Defendant

SAV-ON DRUGS INC.

Not Classified By Court

ERNST DAVID D.

Other

FOSTER CHARLES E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAECKER MARK

Defendant Attorney

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2007
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; Jury Trial - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA LEMUS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (W/ PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2007
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MARIA LEMUS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-Failure to Prosecute Case; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; OSC-Failure to Prosecute Case - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MARIA LEMUS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED - SAV-ON DRUGS,INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by MARIA LEMUS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA LEMUS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAV-ON DRUGS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant