This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 08:38:56 (UTC).

MARC LIZER VS BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2006 MARC LIZER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BCS CONSTRUCTION DEVELOPMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL HARWIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3818

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL HARWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER KRUFAL

LIZER MARC

KRUFAL CHRISTOPHER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC

DENNIS BAKKENSON

DEWEY TOWN LLC A CALIF LTD/ LIABILITY

DOES 1-50

MCALISTER INVESTMENTS INC.

SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC INC.

VALLEY VISTA MANAGEMENT LLC

BAKKENSON DENNIS

Interested Parties

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC

SMYLIE ROBERT OWEN

Not Classified By Court

SCHAU JAN FRANKEL

SCAFFOLDING VAN NUYS

CJK CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SLADE LARRY ESQ.

BLOOM AARON B

Defendant Attorneys

BRECKA JUDITH A.

NASSIE DANIEL ALAN

BARRETT ROBERT MATTHEW

SIGLER JAMES ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Default Prove Up Hearing (Hearing-Default Prove-up; Judgment-Default After Prove-up) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by CHRISTOPHER KRUFAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by CHRISTOPHER KRUFAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Trial; Not held) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Trial; Not held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketNotice-Bankruptcy; Filed by BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC (Legacy Party); DENNIS BAKKENSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Motion; Granted-Order signed & filed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2006
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARC LIZER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued-Department dark) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • DocketAnswer-Cross-Complaint; Filed by MARC LIZER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC (Legacy Party); SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC (Legacy Party); SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC (Legacy Party); SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARC LIZER (Plaintiff); CHRISTOPHER KRUFAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CJK CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ACE TEK ROOFING CO is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY COMPANY OF THE PACIFIC A CALIFO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGLER JAMES ARTHUR