This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2016 at 02:46:38 (UTC).

Lynda Figueroa Vs Moses Figueroa

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Lynda Figueroa against Moses Figueroa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1638

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Diaz, Rudolph

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Figueroa Linda

Figueroa Lynda

Respondent

Figueroa Moses

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • Order-After Hearing Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Verification of Completion Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Response-Decl-OSC/Ntc of Motion Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice-Assign.-Med. Hrg. Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Application-Reissuance of OSC & Or Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Request-Modification Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2002
  • Declaration-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2002
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2002
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2002
  • Request-Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2002
  • Declaration-Income & Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2001
  • Notice-Rejctn Req for Deflt Settng (DEFAULT HAS NOT BEEN ENTERED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • Request-Default Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2001
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.