Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 00:09:30 (UTC).

LUCILA GARCIA VS W H SMITH OF NEVADA INC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2003 LUCILA GARCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against W H SMITH OF NEVADA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FUMIKO WASSERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1575

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FUMIKO WASSERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DE JESUS ELSIE

DE JESUS REYMUNDO

GARCIA LUCILA

OBANDO BELMA

Defendants and Respondents

MEGERDICHIEN HENRY

W.H SMITH USA TRAVEL RETAIL

W.H. SMITH OF NEVADA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SPIRO IRA ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2003
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 16, Fumiko Wasserman, Presiding; OSC - No Return of Service - Court makes order pursuant to OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2003
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVEL TRADERS OF NEVADA INC. is a litigant