This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2015 at 17:48:02 (UTC).

L.M.J. & Associates, Inc. Vs Basic Blue, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by L M J Associates Inc against Basic Blue Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6657

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Arnold Levin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.M.J. & Associates Inc.

Defendants

Access Blue

Basic Blue Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2002
  • Writ of Execution filed (for writ issued L.A. Co. 12-11-01 ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • Satisfaction of Judgment ((full) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (with prejudice as to entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2001
  • Writ issued (L..A.CO. ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2001
  • Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2001
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2001
  • Judgment (against defendant pursuant to stipulation ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2001
  • Stipulation (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ) Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2001
  • Declaration (OF MARK D. BRUZKUS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BASIC BLUE, INC. DBA ACCESS BLUE BE ENTERED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2001
  • Ord to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Proof of Service (MICHAEL SHIN, AUTHORIZED AGENT TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS ) Filed by Attorney for Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Notice (OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • Appl for Attach/Temp Protect Order (BASIC BLUE, INC., A CALIF. CORP. DBA ACCESS BLUE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.