This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 00:50:25 (UTC).

LEON BANKS ET AL VS BALDWIN HILLS CRENSHAW PLAZA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2007 LEON BANKS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BALDWIN HILLS CRENSHAW PLAZA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6659

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANKS LEON

BANKS ROSE MARIE

Defendants

ADVANCED SECURITY CONCEPTS CORPORATION

BALDWIN HILLS CRENSHAW PLAZA LLC

DOES 1-10

HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES

THE FESTIVAL COMPANIES

Not Classified By Court

SMITHSON DAVID M.

Other

COLLINS BILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAGSTEIN ERAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GRAY GARY S. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; (Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; (Final Pretrial Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • Docketat 1:00 PM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leon Banks (Plaintiff); Rose Marie Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DocketNotice-Reassgnment-Mediator; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADR NEUTRAL RECUSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Leon Banks (Plaintiff); Rose Marie Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Leon Banks (Plaintiff); Rose Marie Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE (PREMISES LIABILITY), ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Leon Banks (Plaintiff); Rose Marie Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leon Banks (Plaintiff); Rose Marie Banks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE (PREMISES LIABILITY); ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALDWIN HILLS CRENSHAW PLAZA is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED SECURITY CONCEPTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAY GARY STEPHEN