This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2016 at 23:08:44 (UTC).

Kimberley M. Walker Vs. Damon Walker

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Kimberley M Walker against Damon Walker in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2397

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Walker Kimberley M.

Walker Kimberly M

Respondent

Walker Damon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2015
  • Order-After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Proof of Service-Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request-Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Declaration-Income & Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Request-Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Proof of Service-Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Responsive Decl-OSC/MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2001
  • Judgment (MARITAL STATUS TERM. 9/18/01 ) Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • Order-Assigning Salary or Wages Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2001
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • Request-Default Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Order-Forma Pauperis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.