This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 21:12:10 (UTC).

KARINA ARANA VS RODNEY HIGGINSON

Case Summary

On 05/06/2003 KARINA ARANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODNEY HIGGINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY O'BRIEN, DAN THOMAS OKI and CONRAD R. ARAGON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5201

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY O'BRIEN

DAN THOMAS OKI

CONRAD R. ARAGON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARANA KARINA

Defendants and Respondents

HIGGINSON RODNEY

RAMIREZ JOSE

Not Classified By Court

KAUFMAN ALBERT I

Other

JAMISON & ASSOC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAMAHA THOMAS J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MIGOYA KELLY WOOLSEY ESQ.

ABELTIN & MIGOYA LLP

WERNER MIGOYA & ABELTIN LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

4/14/2008: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

10/10/2008: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketNotice-Change-Firm Name / Address; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketWrit issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST $14,083.70 . MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 7/10/08 NO COURT FILE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • DocketNotice of Association of Attorneys; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • DocketAppl for Writ of Execution & Ord; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • DocketWrit issued (WRIT L.A.CO. ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2004
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2004
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 49, Conrad R. Aragon, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2003
  • DocketRequest (8-22-03 DEFAULT REJECTED AS TO RODNEY HIGGINSON, #18 AND #43 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2003
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2003
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2003
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2003
  • DocketProof of Service (by mail/ smm & comp etc ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2003
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligence (prsn srvd Rodney Higginson ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2003
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2003
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamison & Associates, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIGOYA KELLY WOOLSEY ESQ.