This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 20:49:09 (UTC).

JUAN H VS FIDENCIO SILVA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2004 JUAN H filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FIDENCIO SILVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2831

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H. JUAN

Defendants

DIOCESE OF FRESNO

LOS ANGELES ARCHDIOCESE

MISSIONARIES OF THE HOLY SPIRIT

OUR LADY OF GUADALUPE CHURCH

SILVA FIDENCIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEREDIA F. SAMUEL ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCase File - Public

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2004
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2004
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juan H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2004
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Diocese of Fresno (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2004
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2004
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Juan H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Juan H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juan H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less