This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 08:37:30 (UTC).

JOSEFA LERNER VS DALI DALE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/22/2004 JOSEFA LERNER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DALI DALE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3374

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALICIA INC

BUREAU OF ENGINEERING

DALI DALE INC

DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER OF THE CITY

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

HIGHLAND FEDERAL BANK

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CHUANG GEORGE ESQ.

DELGADILLO ROCKARD J. CITY ATTORNEY

DAVIES JOHN W.

MOONEY F. BENTLEY JR. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Lerner Josefa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON QUIET TITLE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72; (Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2005
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
299 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2004
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2004
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2004
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • DocketCase File - Public

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY, FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lerner Josefa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less