This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2015 at 15:36:14 (UTC).

Jose Antonio Medrano Vs Rickey Keith Blalock

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Jose Antonio Medrano against Rickey Keith Blalock in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7220

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

William Maclaughlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Medrano Jose Antonio

Defendants

Blalock Rickey K.

Blalock Rickey Keith An Individual

Chavez Angel Anselmo Rueda An

Federal Security Corp.

Federal Security Corporation A Business

Medrano Jose A.

Shannon Brothers Company A Business

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2001
  • General Denial (to cross-complaint of Shannon Brother Company ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2001
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY MAIL PERSON SERVED, SHANNON BROTHERS CO 03/23/01 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY MAIL, PERSON SERVED, FEDERAL SECURITY CORPORATION 03/21/01 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (STATUS CONFERENCE, DATE OF RECEIPT, 03/26/01 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.