This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 02:21:15 (UTC).

JONATHAN PRINCE VS JULIE WARNER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2006 JONATHAN PRINCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JULIE WARNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7014

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRINCE JONATHAN

Respondent

WARNER JULIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2015
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) (re: Once A Frog, Inc. Profit Shari ng Plan PLACED CERTIFIED COPY IN ATTY. SER. PICK UP BOX ON 10/30/20 15 - ABC LEGAL )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) ((Conformed copy in atty. pick up b ox) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) ((Basic Benefit Plan and Supplement al Benefit Plan)(Certified on 11/8 /2010) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Receipt ((Directors Guild of America-Produc er Pension Plans) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Receipt ((Division of SAG producers Pension Benefits) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Receipt ((Division of Producer-Writers Guil d of America Pension Plan) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • Stipulation, Appearance & Waivers Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2008
  • Request-Joinder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • Joinder-Pleading

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2007
  • Order-Waiver Court Fees & Cost Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2007
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2007
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less