This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2016 at 08:44:54 (UTC).

John P Lehnhardt Vs Kirsten J Lehnhardt

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by John P Lehnhardt against Kirsten J Lehnhardt in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7755

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Stewart, William D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lehnhardt John P

Respondent

Lehnhardt Kristen J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2009
  • Notice-Withhold Income-Child Suppt Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • Agreement-C/C-stip ord-cust&parent Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • Notice-Withhold Income-Child Suppt Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • Agreement-C/C-stip ord-cust&parent Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Responsive Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • Verification of Completion Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • Unknown document Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2001
  • Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • Notice-Entry-Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • Request-Default Setting Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition-Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.