This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 15:04:53 (UTC).

JILL HIDALGO VS ROBERT COHEN M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2006 JILL HIDALGO filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT COHEN M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRACY GRANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8816

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TRACY GRANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JILL HIDALGO

HIDALGO JILL

Defendants

DOES 1-50

ROBERT COHEN M.D.

SERENITY( SERENITY SKIN & BODY CENTER)

SOUTHLAND SURGICAL CENTER(IMPACT SURGICAL

TAMLIN SANTOS

SERENITY SERENITY SKIN & BODY CENTER

SOUTHLAND SURGICAL CENTERIMPACT SURGICAL

TOWNSEND RON W. ATTY AT LAW

SANTOS TAMLIN

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP STRASSBURG

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH WEBER

BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN

Cross Defendants

CHEN ROBERT M.D.

ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE ( ON X COMP SERENITY)

Not Classified By Court

BULMASH LINDA B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARVIS & KRIEGER

Defendant Attorneys

TOWNSEND RON W. ATTY AT LAW

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP (STRASSBURG )

BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH( WEBER)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (PLNTF- HILDAGO WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department Legacy; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SP86, TRACY GRANT, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE:FILING OF DISMISSAL/ORSIGNED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT(need dismissal of complaint)msj:8/16/07jt:9/17/07) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (DEFT- TAMLIN SANTOS NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC RE DISM ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by TAMLIN SANTOS (Defendant); LEWIS,BRISBOIS,BISGAARD & SMITH( WEBER) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SP86, TRACY GRANT, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING FILING OF DISMISSAL ORSIGNED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by SERENITY( SERENITY SKIN & BODY CENTER) (Defendant); TOWNSEND, RON W. ATTY AT LAW (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S SUMMONS, COMP P.S SOUTHLAND SURGICAL CENTER P.S TIM SCHULTZ, PRES 9-18-6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S SUMMONS, CMP ETC. P.S ROBERT COHEN M.D. SERVED LAW OFFICE OF TAYLOR & BLES SEY, ATTY TAYLOR 9-21-6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S SUMMONS, COMP ETC. P.S - SERENITY, BUS FORM UNK SERVED EKATERINI POPPAS, CO OWNER 10-4-6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JILL HIDALGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT COHEN ON BEHALF OF COHEN KIDS LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where BERMAN BERMAN & BERMAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOWNSEND RON W.