This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 03:04:27 (UTC).

JILKA K POLLACK VS FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/27/2007 JILKA K POLLACK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7030

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLLACK JILKA K.

Defendants

CARNEY JARED

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LESSER JOSHUA

THE MILKEN FAMILY FOUNDATION

THE MILKEN INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCPHERSON EDWIN F.

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN THOMAS P. IV

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jilka K. Pollack (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jilka K. Pollack (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jilka K. Pollack (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less