This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 10:21:32 (UTC).

JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL VS. RECHEM INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2006 JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RECHEM INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KHAN, ABRAHAM and STEVEN D. BLADES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8012

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KHAN, ABRAHAM

STEVEN D. BLADES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HUATAI IMPORT AND EXPORT CO. LTD.

JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHEN WEI

RECHEM INTERNATIONAL INC.

WEI CHEN

Others

THATCHER DAVID N LAW OFFICES OF

MURTAGH PAUL G. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

HOSMER DAVID E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZANIAS JAMES C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHAO LYNN ATTORNEY AT LAW

GRANT JAMES T. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment By Court ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department G; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department G, Steven D. Blades, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • DocketStatement of Decision; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • DocketStatement of Decision; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketOpposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
295 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (RECHEM INTERNATIONAL, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO CO. LTD A CHINESE BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT JAMES T.