This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2016 at 22:52:07 (UTC).

JAMES SPADER VS VICTORIA KHEEL SPADER

Case Summary

On 04/16/2003 JAMES SPADER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VICTORIA KHEEL SPADER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0943

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2003

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SPADER JAMES

Respondent

SPADER VICTORIA KHEEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARBAKOW & RIBET

Respondent Attorney

EDELMAN EMILY SHAPPELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2010
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2007
  • Notice Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • Notice-Unavailablity-Counsel Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2004
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2003
  • Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNS EL ) Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2003
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2003
  • Summons Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2003
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2003
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less