This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 07:50:54 (UTC).

JACKIE RUI SUN VS JACK SUN

Case Summary

On 03/14/2005 JACKIE RUI SUN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACK SUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES W. MCCOY, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, C. EDWARD SIMPSON, MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR., BRIAN F. GASDIA and ESPINOZA, PETER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5062

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHARLES W. MCCOY

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR.

BRIAN F. GASDIA

ESPINOZA, PETER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN JACKIE RUI

Defendants

CHENG CHEN CHIH

CHENG DENNIS

CHOO CHRIS

GAN DENNY HAO

HARADA ANDREW

HARADA DIANNE

HSU MING CHU

HSU YING P.

JEONG CHRISTOPHER

KAO LAWRENCE CHIH CHANG

KOH SIMON

LEE HYE SOOK

LEE LOUIS

LEE MICHAEL

LIAO CHARLES

LING JIMMY

MYUNG IN SANG

MYUNG MARTIN

MYUNG SANG

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PIERRY & SHENOI LLP

PIERRY & MOORHEAD LAW OFFICES

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY & JENNETT

QI STEVE & ASSOCATES LAW OFFICES OF

GIBSON RIVERA & TOMS LLP

HANGER LEVINE & STEINBERG

LINDQUIST ERIC NELSON LAW OFFICES OF

WALKER ROBERT A. LAW OFFICES OF

KIM KEITH K. LAW OFFICES OF

LIOU MAY LAW OFFICES OF

GTH LAW GROUP

WALKER ROBERT A. LAW OFFICE

HSU ROGER C. LAW OFFICES OF

LIOU MAY APC

LIM RUGER & KIM LLP

HSU ROBERT C. LAW OFFICE OF

STEVE QI & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF

RYU & JOO LLP

HANGER LEVINE & STEINBERG ALC

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, Raul A. Sahagun, Presiding; Motion for an Order - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DocketApplication - Misc (DEFENDANTS ALEX TCHEN'S DANNY TCHEN'S AND HA LA TCHEN'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DocketOrder (ON APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS ALEX TCHEN, DANNY TCHEN AND HA LA TCHEN ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • Docketat 08:55 am in Department H, McKnew, Thomas I., Jr., Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC C/F 3-8-06FSC= 3-22-06T/D= 4-5-06) - MSC held - settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, Raul A. Sahagun, Presiding; Motion to Compel - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, Espinoza, Peter, Presiding; ExParte Proceeding - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (for order shortening time for hearing on motion for determin. good fth settlement. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketOrder (shortenting time for hearing on deft. paul shin motion for determin. of gd. fth. settlemt ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl ( SANG MYUNG ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (ANDREW HARADA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl ( DIANNE HARADA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (DENNIS CHENG ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl ( CHEN CHIH CHENG ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (RE DOE 1 MILTON M. SUN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (RE DOE 2 MEI F. YU ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDQUIST ERIC NELSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim, Keith K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROBERT