Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:35:24 (UTC).

INTERTAINMENT LICENSING VS COMERICA BANK CALIF ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2002 INTERTAINMENT LICENSING filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against COMERICA BANK CALIF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN, CAROLYN B. KUHL, JAMES C. CHALFANT and ALAN G. BUCKNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6612

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

CAROLYN B. KUHL

JAMES C. CHALFANT

ALAN G. BUCKNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERTAINMENT LICENSING GMBH

GMBH INTERTAINMENT LICENSING

Defendants

CARDONE STEVE

COMERICA BANK CALIFORNIA

CONNECTICUT SURETY GROUP

FILM FINANCES CANADA (1998) LTD.

FILM FINANCES INC.

RECTOR MORGAN

UNDERWOOD JARED

WORLDWIDE FILM COMPLETION INC.

XL REINSURANCE AMERICA INC.

FILM FINANCES CANADA 1998 LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDELMAN SCOTT A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BINGHAM MCCUCHEN LLP

RANSOHOFF STEVEN

WACHTELL MICHAEL L. ATTORNEY AT LAW

VALERIANO GARY J. ESQ.

RIBAKOFF DAVID Z. ESQ.

GANS GARY E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMERICA BANK, MORGAN RECTOR AND JARED UNDERWOODS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/14/2011: COMERICA BANK, MORGAN RECTOR AND JARED UNDERWOODS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

8/2/2011: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketCase Document - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketCase Document - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 13; (Order ReRelated Cases; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketCOMERICA BANK, MORGAN RECTOR AND JARED UNDERWOODS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 13; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Comerica Bank California (Defendant); Jared Underwood (Defendant); Morgan Rector (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Comerica Bank California (Defendant); Jared Underwood (Defendant); Morgan Rector (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Filed by XL Reinsurance America, Inc. (Defendant); Film Finances Canada, (1998) Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2002
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Intertainment Licensing GMBH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUD; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Intertainment Licensing GMBH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUD, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Film Finances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XL REINSURANCE AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMERICA BANK - CALIFORNIA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO IMPERIAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALERIANO GARY J. ESQ.