This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 18:13:54 (UTC).

BARRY BERNSON VS. CITY OF DOWNEY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2006 BARRY BERNSON filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against CITY OF DOWNEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, CAROLYN KUHL, BRIAN F. GASDIA, MEYERS, PATRICK and WEST, CARL J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6716

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

CAROLYN KUHL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MEYERS, PATRICK

WEST, CARL J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADAMS MIKE

ALATORRE NORMAN

BASILE SKYE ASHLEY

BASILE STEVEN

BAYS LESTER

BERNSON BARRY

BURNES WAYNE

CHRISTENSEN DEREK

DRESSOR ERIC

ESTATE OF KEVIN POSTEL

GONZALEZ JESUS

HANSARD ARAGORN

HANSEN FRILL

HIGGINS RODNEY

HILL JEFF M.

INEZ ANTHONY

INGRAHAM RANDY

IZUMI JOHN

LAPRELL ROBERT

LITWAK JAMIE L.

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYMAN & APELIAN

Other Attorneys

BARG COFFIN LEWIS & TRAPP LLP

CARPENTER ROTHANS & DUMONT

DAVID S. WHITE

DONALD J. HAMMAN

FAINSBERT MASE & SNYDER LLP

LA STUDIOS OPERATING COMPANY LLC

LEWIS N. LEVY

MCDONOUGH HOLLAND & ALLEN PC

MITCHELL SILBERBERG & KNUPP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

RICHARD C. COFFIN

STRADLING YOCCA CARLSON & RAUTH

WILLIAM A. SOKOL

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

WILSON PETTY KOSMO & TURNER

WHITE DAVID S.

GUILFORD STEINER SARVAS & CARBONARA

HAMMAN DONALD J.

6 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/03/2011

DocketRemittitur filed ( DISMISSED ); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2011

DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Downey (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leonard Martin (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Leonard Martin (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice x-complaint filed 11-6-07 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketProof of Service (by mail (request for dismissal) ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice entire action ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2010

DocketNotice (request for judicial notice ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2010

DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Leonard Martin (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,234 More Docket Entries
09/25/2006

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter is continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2006

Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter is continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2006

DocketFirst Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2006

DocketFirst Amended Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2006

DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2006

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2006

DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2006

DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/1990

DocketNotice (of entry of judgment ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/1990

DocketNotice; Filed by Downey Studios, LLC (Defendant); Industrial Realty Group, LLC (Defendant); IRG Downey, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less