This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 16:19:04 (UTC).

IHAR ALSHEUSKI VS. MAKITA U.S.A., INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2002 IHAR ALSHEUSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MAKITA U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES A. BASCUE and RETIRED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0655

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES A. BASCUE

RETIRED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALSHEUSKI IHAR

Defendants

JOHNNY'S CABINETS INC.

MAKITA CORPORATION OF AMERICA

MAKITA U.S.A. INC.

MANCUSO FRANCES

MANCUSO FRANK

MANCUSO SR. FRANK G.

MANGUS FRANK

TIMOCHENKO VLADIMIR

TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORP

Other

SR. MANCUSO FRANK G.

Not Classified By Court

RANDALL S HENDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKLAR JULIA LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Other Attorneys

BRAGG SEROTA & KULUVA

FEENEY KELLETT WIENNER & BUSH

Other Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

SAGHEB SOHAILA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2003
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department WEN, James A. Bascue, Presiding; Jury Trial (7-10 days) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2003
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEN, James A. Bascue, Presiding; Final Status Conference (td: 8/20/03) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2003
  • Docketat 08:00 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Not held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2003
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEN, James A. Bascue, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status (MEDIATION IS TO BE COMPLETED BY7-11-03) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2003
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (BY JUDGE BASCUE (SEE 7/15/03 MINUTES) ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2003
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEN, James A. Bascue, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - Off Calendar-No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEN, James A. Bascue, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment - Off-Calendar-Request-Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2003
  • DocketNotice (OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT AS TO TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2002
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • DocketCross-complaint filed (FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND EXPRESS INDEMINITY ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (FEE PAID BY BRAGG, SEROTA & KULUVA ATTY FOR DEFT. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2002
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • DocketCross-complaint filed (for implied and equitable indemnity and declaratory relief; ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint (FEE PAID BY FEENEY KELLETT WIENNER & BUSH ATTY FOR DEFT. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2002
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVM WOODWORKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant