This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2015 at 13:47:58 (UTC).

Harold L. Melsheimer Vs Sabrina Melsheimer, Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2002 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by Harold L Melsheimer against Sabrina Melsheimer in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1928

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Stanley Weisberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melsheimer Harold L.

Defendants

Does 1-50

Melsheimer Norma

Melsheimer Sabrina

Sykes Ann

Sykes Norma

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2005
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2003
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Declaration (OF PLAINTIFF HAROLD L. MELSHEIMER ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Judgment (BY COURT PER DECLARATION ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1 - 50, ONLY. ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • Declaration (INABILITY TO ASCERTAIN ADDRESS ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • Default Entered (AGAINST SABRINA MELSHEIMER AKA NORMA MELSHEIMER, NORMA SYKES, AND ANN SYKES, AN INDIVIDUAL ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2002
  • Proof-Publication (AS TO SABRINA MELSHEIMER ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • Application-Pub of Summons Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • Order (FOR PUBLICATION ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2002
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.