This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2016 at 09:08:14 (UTC).

Gwynne Gurevich Vs Leon Gurevich

Case Summary

On 02/06/2001 a Family - Legal Separation case was filed by Gwynne Gurevich against Leon Gurevich in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9173

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gurevich Gwynne

Respondent

Gurevich Leon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2013
  • Stipulation & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2002
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment (MARITAL STATUS ENDS ON 02/21/02 ) Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2002
  • Judgment Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • Decl For Deflt or Uncontested Jdgm Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • Declaration-Property Instructions Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2001
  • Stipulation, Appearance & Waivers Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2001
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2001
  • Summons Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2001
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.