This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2015 at 17:48:10 (UTC).

Globalist Internet Technologies Inc Vs Iron Horse Holdings

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Property - Other Property Fraud case was filed by Globalist Internet Technologies Inc against Iron Horse Holdings in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6660

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Ernest Hiroshige

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Globalist Internet Technologies Inc.

Salari Soorena

Defendants

Internet Business International

Internet Business's International Inc.

Iron Horse Holdings Inc.

Reda Albert R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2001
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2001
  • Receipt for Case/Ch of Venue/Trans Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2001
  • Notice (re stipulation of change of venue ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • Stipulation and Order (RE: CHANGE OF VENUE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.