This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 20:32:08 (UTC).

GINGER VENTURES LLC ET AL VS LA CIENEGA NO 57 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2007 GINGER VENTURES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LA CIENEGA NO 57 LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4871

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONCEPT DISALVIO LLC

DISALVIO DAVID

GINGER VENTURES LLC

MILLER MARIA MINICUCCI

Defendants

AKHTARZAD JOSHUA

AKHTARZAD SINA

LA CIENEGA NO 57 LLC

NASA GROUP THE

Not Classified By Court

KOSSOFF KENNETH W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALLSTROM GRANT J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DRUCKER MICHAEL S. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL S. DRUCKER RE: PAYMENT OF MONETARY SANCTIONS IMPOSED BY JUDGE RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. OTTE RE COMPLIANCE WITH OCTOBER 30, 2008 ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Ginger Ventures, LLC (Plaintiff); Concept Disalvio, LLC (Plaintiff); David Disalvio (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • DocketDECLARATION AND ORDER RE: ADVANCE JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ginger Ventures, LLC (Plaintiff); Concept Disalvio, LLC (Plaintiff); David Disalvio (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ginger Ventures, LLC (Plaintiff); Concept Disalvio, LLC (Plaintiff); David Disalvio (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ginger Ventures, LLC (Plaintiff); Concept Disalvio, LLC (Plaintiff); David Disalvio (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less