This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 15:43:59 (UTC).

Gerson, Kevin D. Vs Coffield, Adrienne S.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Gerson Kevin D against Coffield Adrienne S in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3980

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gerson Kevin D.

Respondent

Coffield Adrienne S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2001
  • Notice-Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2001
  • Agreement-Marital Settlement Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2001
  • Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2001
  • Declaration-Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • Acknowledgement-Receipt Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • Affidavit-Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2001
  • Petition-Amended (1st) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.