Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 19:26:55 (UTC).

FORBES M. CAMPBELL VS. AMERICAN STANDARD INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2007 FORBES M CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN STANDARD INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE, LEE SMALLEY EDMON, DAVID L. MINNING, MALCOLM MACKEY, WILLIAM F. FAHEY and RALPH W. DAU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5634

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

DAVID L. MINNING

MALCOLM MACKEY

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

RALPH W. DAU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL FORBES M.

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

AMERICAN STANDARD PRODUCTS INC.

AQUA-CHEM INC.

ASCO VALVE INC.

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC.

BORG WARNER CORPORATION

BRENNTAG WEST INC.

BROTHER CHEMICAL COMPANY

BUFFALO PUMPS INC.

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CLEVER-BROOKS INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY USA INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL USA INC.

CROWN HOLDINGS INC.

DOES 1 TO 450

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.

56 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDDINS RON C.

Defendant Attorneys

A. SCOTT GOLDBERG

BAILEY MICHAEL H. ESQ.

MICHAEL J. PIETRYKOWSKI

JAMISON KEVIN

WATERS KATHLEEN A. ESQ.

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

JENKINS CHARLES W. ESQ.

CHUSID BRUCE G. ESQ.

ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES LLP

AREZOU KHONSARI ESQ.

JACKSON & WALLACE

GLAZIER GUY P. ESQ.

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL

POOLE & SHAFFERY

ADAMS NYE SINUNU & WALKER LLP

CARROLL BURDICK & MCDONOUGH LLP

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

PURDY DOUGLAS C. ESQ.

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/30/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketObjection Document; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketDEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF THE COURTS RULING AS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX ELLIOTTS CLAIMED COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketDEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS NOTICE OF THE COURTS RULING AS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX ELLIOTTS CLAIMED COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketDEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS NOTICE OF THE COURTS RULING AS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX ELLIOTTS CLAIMED COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
815 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2007
  • DocketDEFENDANT ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elementis Chemicals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Forbes M. Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS [NEGLIGENCE; ETC]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Forbes M. Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Forbes M. Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2000
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ELEMENTS CHEMICALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCO VALVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant