This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2015 at 19:39:20 (UTC).

Ethel Nesbitt Vs City Of Inglewood, Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Ethel Nesbitt against City Of Inglewood in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9985

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Jean E. Matusinka

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nesbitt Ethel

Defendants

Inglewood City Of

Los Angeles City Of

Los Angeles County Of

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2002
  • Notice (NTC TO BOOKKEEPER TO TRANSFER JURY FEES POSTED ON TRUST FOR THE AMNT OF $150 RECEIPT # SBA 285720027 TO COURT COSTS ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • Notice (NTC TO BOOKKEPING TO TRANSFER JURY FEES POSTED ON TRUST FOR THE AMNT OF $150 RECEIPT # SBA 401620032 TO COURT COSTS ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2002
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W-PRED DISMISSED THE COMPLAINT AND AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2002
  • Notice (NTC OF FURTHER OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2002
  • Notice (NTC OF FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • Notice of Settlement (AND OSC RE DISMISSAL SET 5-16-02 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • Declaration (OF CLAUDIA DE LA ROSA RE EX PARTE NOTICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • Order (ON EX PTE APPLIC TO CONT FSC SET 2-13-02 TO 3-20-02 AND TRL SET 2-26-02 TO 4-3-02 (JEM) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2002
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR AN ORD TO CONT TRL DTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2001
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/O-PRED DISMISSED AS TO DEFT CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2001
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2001
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2001
  • Notice of Ruling (ON DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2001
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2001
  • Proof of Service (RE SUMMONS, COMPLT & NTC OF ST CONF OF DEFT CITY OF L.A. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2001
  • Reply to Opposition (TO THE DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2001
  • Opposition (TO DEMURRER TO COMPLT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2001
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLT SET 7-17-01 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.