This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 07:35:09 (UTC).

ESTATE OF KHOSROWKHAH-KORD, ALI

Case Summary

On 08/17/2000 ESTATE OF KHOSROWKHAH-KORD, ALI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STOLL, CHARLES W. and SWART, COLEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5254

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STOLL, CHARLES W.

SWART, COLEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Executors

MOINI GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB

TAHMASSEBI GUITA

KHOSROWKHAH KHOSROW PARVIZ

Others

KORD KHASHAYAR

KHOSROWKHAH KHOSROW PARVIZ

Not Classified By Court

PRICE STANLEY M.

Decedents

KHOOSROWKHAH-KORD ALI

KHOSROWKHAH-KORD ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VOGT & RESNICK LLP

MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES

RESNICK & GRAY

MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF

PARKER JOHN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2007
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2007
  • Declaration (of golnaz montakhab moini's regarding distributon to khosrow parviz khosrowkhah Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2007
  • Receipt (miria ghaffari sadeghi Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2007
  • Notice (of lodging confidential filing of receipts upon distribution to khosrow parviz khosrowkhah Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • Order - Approving Account (Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • Termination of Supervision (Conversion Purpose)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • Notice (ntc of lodging receipts upon distribution. Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • Notice - Hearing (Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner: Executor Repres. By: VOGT & RESNICK, LLP, Attorney for Executor )

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2000
  • Declaration (OF SHARON L. BILBEISI Filed By: MOINI, GOLNAZ MONTAKHAB, Petitioner Repres. By: RESNICK & GRAY, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • Probate - Other (Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution Other - Misc. Disposition Manner PROPOSED EXECUTOR'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSTN SUBPOENA SERVED ON BANK OF AMERICA FOR BANK RECORD OF DECEDENT. 1st Hearing Date: 11/17/2000 Filed By: KHOSROWKHAH, KHOSROW PARVIZ, Objector Repres. By: MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES, Former Attorney for Defendant Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2000
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2000
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2000
  • Notice - Hearing (2 Notice of Hearing - Notice of Petn to Administer Est. Filed By: KHOSROWKHAH, KHOSROW PARVIZ, Objector Repres. By: MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES, Former Attorney for Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2000
  • Supplement (Verified Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration Filed By: KHOSROWKHAH, KHOSROW PARVIZ, Objector Repres. By: MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES, Former Attorney for Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2000
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2000
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2000
  • Proof - Holographic Instrument (Filed By: KHOOSROWKHAH-KORD, ALI, Subject Person Filed By: KHOSROWKHAH, KHOSROW PARVIZ, Objector Repres. By: MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES, Former Attorney for Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2000
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (1st Hearing Date: 09/22/2000 Filed By: KHOSROWKHAH, KHOSROW PARVIZ, Objector Filed By: MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES, Former Attorney for Defendant Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.