This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 09:55:04 (UTC).

ELROY GRIFFIETH, JR. VS.CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2002 ELROY GRIFFIETH, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOIS A. SMALTZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4632

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOIS A. SMALTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD CONCRETE PUMPING L.A.

GRIFFIETH ELROY JR.

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

AMERICAN STANDARD CONCRETE PUMPING- ROE 1

LENNOX UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN PUMP CORPORATION

CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES INC.

DJM CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

LIQUIST PUMP CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JANOFF KARPEL & COWAN

KRIMEN RICHARD A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

POLLARD ARCHER CRANERT GOOGOOIAN & STEVEN

KELLAM & BIEDEBACH LLP

HAFFNER HAFFNER & KIRWIN

MOLFETTA & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (JURY TRIAL) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketNotice (TO BOOKKEEPER TO TRANSFER JURY DEPOSIT TO JURYFEE RECEIPT #SBB461346015 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketRefund of Jury Fees ($150 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketNotice (TO BOOKKEEPER TO TRANSFER JURY DEPOSIT TO JURYFEE, RECEIPT #SBA454377007 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketNotice (TO BOOKKEEPER TO REFUND JURY DEPOSIT TO KELLAM & BIEDEBACH RECEIPT #SBB269981006 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION W/ PREJ. ATTY FOR X/COMPLAINT - AMERICAN CONCRETE PUMPING - L.A. INC. - SIGNED THE DISMISSAL. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES ON 11/19/02 ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (AS TO STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUNDS COMPLAINT ONLY AS TO CASE# YC044641 ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2003
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DJM CONSTRUCTION ON 4/16/03 ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; Jury Trial - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2003
  • DocketDeclaration (OF PLTFF'S COUNSEL RE STATUS OF SERVICE. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED AMERICAN STANDARD CONCRETE PUMPING-L.A. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (PARTY SERVED: DJM CONSTRUCTION CO. SERVED: LISSETTE CORREA (AUTH PRSN ON 12-13-02 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (HAVING DISCOVERED THE TRUE NAME OF SAID DEFENDANT TO BE TO BE AMERICAN STANDARD CONRETE PUMPING L.A., INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; OSC-Failure to Prosecute Case - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED - CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (OF CONCRETE FORMTEK SERVICES, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2002
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lennox Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant