This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 16:35:48 (UTC).

EDERLEN CASILLAS VS. ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2006 EDERLEN CASILLAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN, PRATT, DANIEL SOLIS, ESPINOZA, PETER, BIRNEY, WILLIAM J. JR. and MEYERS, PATRICK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6184

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

PRATT, DANIEL SOLIS

ESPINOZA, PETER

BIRNEY, WILLIAM J. JR.

MEYERS, PATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS EDERLEN

Defendants

ATCHESON'S EXPRESS INC.

JUATHES ABHIJAI

Intervenor Defendant

WILLIAMSBURG NATIONAL INSURANCE CO.

Not Classified By Court

GARCIA ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEDERER NOJIMA TAGLIAFERO LOPRESTI

LEDERER NOJIMA TAGLIAFERO LOPRESTI &

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN STRUCK & BALLOG LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2007
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2007
  • DocketStipulation and Order ( SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketJudgment ( VACATED PER STIP/ORDER 6-12-07 ); Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department P, Birney, William J. Jr., Presiding; Jury Trial - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2006
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON ATCHESONS EXPRESS INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EDERLEN CASILLAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Williamsburg National Insurance Co is a litigant

Latest cases where ATCHISON EXPRESS is a litigant