Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 18:27:47 (UTC).

EBRAHIM SOLTANI VS ANDREW GLASSELL ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2006 EBRAHIM SOLTANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANDREW GLASSELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN KUHL, WILLIAM G. WILLETT, LOIS A. SMALTZ and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4181

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN KUHL

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

LOIS A. SMALTZ

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLTANI AHDIEH

SOLTANI EBRAHIM

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ACTION ROOFING INC.- DOE 3 / MOE 1

ASSOCIATED BUILDING SUPPLY INC. [DOE 9]

BATTAGLIA INC.- DOE 5 / MOE 2

EBERS PAINTING - ROE 1

EBERS RICHARD (DBA EBERS PAINTING)-ROE 2

EBERS RICHARD HAROLD (DOE 18) BAKKE CONS

EBERS RICHARD HAROLD - DOE 17

FAMART WELDING INC. - DOE 15/ ROE 3

GENERAL SHEET METAL CO.-DOE 7/ROE 4

GLASSELL ANDREW

GLASSELL DEVELOPMENT INC.

HUNT ROBERT DALE-DOE 11/ ROE 9 .

JOHN BAKKE CONSTRUCTION- DOE 8

JOHN SIMICH CONSTR. INC.- DOE 12/ ROE 6

LANDE'S HVAC INC. - DOE 13/ ROE 7

LUCIEN COTE DBA LUCIEN PLUMBING

LUCIEN PLUMBING - DOE 4

LUCIEN PLUMBING COMPANY - MOE 3

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAKER BURTON & LUNDY

CASTRO & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF BRUCE CORNBLUM DEFT

Defendant Attorneys

JAMPOL ZIMET SKANE & WILCOX LLP

LOBHERR JOHN R. LAW OFFICES OF

BONETATI KINCAID & KINCAID INC.

MARC JENNINGS LAW OFFICES OF

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

PIVO HALBREICH MARTIN WILSON & AMO LLP

MOLFETTA & ASSOCIATES

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

WATERS MCCLUSKEY & BOEHLE

KRAMER DEBOER ENDELICATO & KEANE

SPLINTER ROBERT G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
402 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2007
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2006
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by EBRAHIM SOLTANI (Plaintiff); AHDIEH SOLTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Associated Building Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SHEET METAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOBHERR JOHN R.