This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2015 at 19:12:48 (UTC).

Dr. George Lakner Vs. Coach Usa Los Angeles, Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Dr George Lakner against Coach Usa Los Angeles in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9860

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

William G. Willett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakner George Dr.

Defendant

Coach Usa Los Angeles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2008
  • Notice (OF SIGNING OF ORDER TO CONTINUE BINDING ARB COMPLETION DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Order (TO CONTINUE BINDING ARBITRATION COMPLETION DATE FROM 8/1/08 TO 12/31/08 - ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLETT - ATTY. FOR DEFT. TO GIVE NOTICE) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2008
  • Stipulation (TO CONTINUE BINDING ARBITRATION COMPLETION DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REJECT SHEET RE STIP TO CONTINUE BINDING ARBIT COMPLETION DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER IS REQUIRED ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • Notice (OF UNAVILABILITY OF COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2008
  • Order (GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLETT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • Declaration (OF GABOR SZABO AS PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFTS. OPPOSITION TO PLTFS. PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • Reply To Motion (DEFT. SURREPLY RE: DECLARION OF GABOR SZABO IN REPLY TO DEFTS. OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • Opposition (DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO: 1. PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, 2. REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,500.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY, GABOR SZABO) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2008
  • Petition (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;... 3/27/08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2001
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2001
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ANSWER COACH USA LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.