This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2020 at 19:33:29 (UTC).

DONG SUNG KIM, ET AL VS KUOLIANG JOE HUANG, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2005 DONG SUNG KIM, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KUOLIANG JOE HUANG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD ADLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9520

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD ADLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM AE RAN

KIM DONG SUNG

KIM ROSA

Defendants

DOES 1-10

HUANG KUOLIANG JOE

HUANG LOON-MEI TONG

STEWART-WEST COAST TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE GREGORY MICHAEL

KIM JAE SOO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • Docketat 09:01 am in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; OSC-Dismissal - Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal ( With Prejudice, the Entire Action ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE(CONT. FROM 1-18-05)) - Off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2005
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com ( To Kuiliang Joe Huang ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • DocketDeclaration-Diligence; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • DocketNotice-Continuance; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Conference-Initial Status - Held-Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • Docketin Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Application-Ex-Parte - Denied-Without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Gregory M. Lee Re No Service ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT STEWART-WEST COAST TITLE CO. ONLY ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2004
  • DocketEx-Parte Application ( For Extension of Time To Serve Pleading and Order, Granted. ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less