This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2015 at 05:20:13 (UTC).

DIEGO CARRENO VS WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 05/04/2005 DIEGO CARRENO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK Y. JACKSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6421

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK Y. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARRENO DIEGO

LARA YOLANDA

Defendants

CHALLENGER MIDDLE SCHOOL

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

NELSON-ADAMS CO.

POLYVISION CORP

STEEL CASE INC.

WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RHAMES MICHAEL R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

OPPENHEIM JR. RICHARD D. ESQ.

PRESS STEPHEN M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2006
  • Rec-Depository/Order-Deposit Money Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2006
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STEELCASE, INC., POLYVISION CORP. & NELSON-ADAMS CO. ONLY ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE AS TO X-COMP FILED BY STEELCASE INC ON 07/20/05 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION REJECTED BECAUSE A CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/05 IS STILL OUT STANDING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM, COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR IS SIGNED BY JUDGE JACKSON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • Petition (TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT IS SIGNED BY JUDGE JACKSON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2005
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2005
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED STEELCASE, INC ON 6-23-05 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • Answer to Complaint (WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT ERRON SUED AS CHALLENGER MIDDLE SCHOOL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 5-27-05 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • Order (FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR IS SIGNED BY JUDGE JACKSON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • Notice-Case Management Conference (SET FOR 8-29-05 8:30AM DEPT. A17 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • Notice (OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FRANK JACKSON ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2005
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSONA SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPPENHEIM RICHARD D. JR. ESQ.