This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 02:47:17 (UTC).

DECMAC DEVELOPERS LLC VS LAW OFFICES OF BOWLES & VERNA LLP

Case Summary

On 03/15/2006 DECMAC DEVELOPERS LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against LAW OFFICES OF BOWLES VERNA LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE and MORRIS B. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9010

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

MORRIS B. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DECMAC DEVELOPERS LLC

Defendants

GOLDMAN CHARLES

LAW OFFICES OF BOWLES & VERNA LLP

Cross Defendants

CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC.

POYER MICHAEL J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIRARDI THOMAS V. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN GREGG A. ESQ.

WASSERMAN STEVEN D. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2007
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Law Offices of Bowles & Verna, LLP (Defendant); Charles Goldman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • Docketat 12:00 PM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Law Offices of Bowles & Verna, LLP (Defendant); Charles Goldman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Defendant) -

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2006
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Law Offices of Bowles & Verna, LLP (Defendant); Charles Goldman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2006
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Decmac Developers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Decmac Developers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Decmac Developers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Decmac Developers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSERMAN, STEVEN DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN GREGG ADAM