Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 12:07:55 (UTC).

DAVID SPEISER, VS GREG PETERSEN CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2006 DAVID SPEISER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against GREG PETERSEN CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOIS A. SMALTZ and CAROLYN KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2487

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOIS A. SMALTZ

CAROLYN KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPEISER DAVID

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CARSON TOM - DOE 2

CARSON TOM-DOE 50 (4TH CAUSE OF ACTN ONLY

D-C EASTVALE LLC - POE 1

DON H. MAHAFFEY DRILLING CO. (MOE 17)

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ADDSCAPE INC. (MOE 15)

ALPHA OMEGA BUILDERS

AMERICAN CAISSON INC.(DBA THE MAHAFFEY CO

ASH MICHAEL DANIEL(DBA D&G ASPHALT PAVIN

AUGUST CONSTRUCTION INC. (MOE 6)

BOARTS SANDY -DBA THE DECORATORS

BOES 1-100

D & G PAVING INC. (MOE 3) (JOE 1)

D J SCHEFFLER INC. (MOE 7)

D-C EASTVALE LLC - POE 1

DE LOS REYES MARIA CONNI

DON H. MAHAFFEY DRILLING CO. (MOE 17)

FCM FIREPLACES (MOE 8)

FIRESIDE HEARTH & HOME (MOE 12)

FOES 1-100

FOLCHI CONSTRUCTION

FOLCHI GENERAL CONTRACTOR (MOE 27)

99 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTON TIMOTHY L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WATERS MCCLUSKEY & BOEHLE

RYAN MERCALDO & WORTHINGTON LLP

KLEINDINST PC

KODANI JON & ASSOCIATES

PEGAN KEVIN LAW OFFICES OF

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEIN & PHILLIPS

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

DUN & MARTINEK LLP

MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

EICK WILLIAM E.

BOBIK RALPH M.

JACKSON & WALLACE

CAMPBELL VOLK & LAUTER

MOLFETTA & ASSOCIATES

MARQUIS WILLIAM A.

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL L.L.P.

JAMPOL ZIMET SKANE & WILCOX LLP

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

HAFFNER HAFFNER & KIRWIN LLP

12 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNotice; Filed by PETERSEN, GREG - DOE 1 (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNotice; Filed by GREG PETERSEN CONSTRUCTION, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by DAVID SPEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department M, Lois A. Smaltz, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Req for Dism - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (AS TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/5/06 BY AUGUST CONSTRUC- TION INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
987 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GREG PETERSEN CONSTRUCTION, INC., (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by DAVID SPEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2006
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAVID SPEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRESIDE HEARTH & HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CAISSON, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where D & G PAVING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where D. J. SCHEFFLER, INC. is a litigant