This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 02:54:45 (UTC).

COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPR

Case Summary

On 06/07/2006 COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF SANTA FE SPR was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3556

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMISSION OF THE

Defendants

ANDERSON JANICE M.

ANENBERG DELENE ATKINS

BRASHEAR THOMAS

BROADHEAD DEBRA

BURKHART LINDA

CROCKER WILLIAM H.

EVANS ROBERT REAM

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

GRAY JAMES A.

GRAY TERRI

GREEN KATHLEEN

GREENWELL ILA MARIE

HAMEL DIANE

JOHNSON BETTY JOYCE

KERNEN MARILYN M.

LIEST CLEORA

MATNEY DENISE

MATNEY DORENE

MATNEY MATTHEW

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLIN PETER L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 59; Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
178 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2006
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ROBERT G. ORPIN REGARDNG ADOPTION OF RESOLUTION OF NECESSITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PAUL R. ASHWORTH REGARDING ADOPTION OF RESOLUTION OF NECESSITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF APPRAISER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Community Development Commission of the (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLIN PETER L. ESQ.