This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 07:04:49 (UTC).

CLEOPATRA PENNY BENNETT ET AL VS A W CHESTERTON COMPANY ET

Case Summary

On 06/28/2007 CLEOPATRA PENNY BENNETT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE SMALLEY EDMON, RITA MILLER, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3446

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

RITA MILLER

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENNETT CLEOPATRA "PENNY"

BENNETT DALE

Defendants and Respondents

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ALFA LAVAL INC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABI-

AMERICAN BRAKE MATERIALS CORPORATION

AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDREY COMPANY

AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE COMPANY

AMERICAN BRAKELOK CORPORATION THE

AMERICAN RADIATOR & STANDARD

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC

BORGWARNER INC

BROGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CBS CORPORATION

CHECKER AUTO PARTS

CHRYSLER LLC

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

CRANE CO

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARON & BUDD P.C.

LANGDOC JOHN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM JAMES P. ESQ.

ENGEL ROBERT G.

FOLLIS SAMUEL O. ESQ.

FRENCH B. THOMAS ESQ.

HINGLE STEPHANIE A.

JOHNSON PAUL R.

BIDERMAN DAVID T. ESQ.

BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

HASSARD BONNIGTON LLP

CROCHET CARLA LYNN

MANOLI C.J.

CHUSID BRUCE G. ESQ.

BOONE ROBERT E.

HOFFMAN JAMES E. ESQ.

BOOTH MITCHEL & STARNGE LLP

GORDON & REES LLP

HUGO EDWARD ROGER ESQ.

HEISS REBECCA L.

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

1/2/2008: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/2/2008: DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

1/8/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/11/2008: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY

1/15/2008: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/17/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

311 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2009
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ERIC BROWN; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by BARON & BUDD, P.C. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Cleopatra "Penny" Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 78; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by BARON & BUDD, P.C. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF : JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
813 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cleopatra "Penny" Bennett (Plaintiff); Dale Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BRAKELOK CORPORATION THE is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN RADIATOR & STANDARD is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BRAKE MATERIALS CORPORATION THE is a litigant