This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2015 at 17:45:43 (UTC).

Claudia Mcelroy Et Al Vs Thorpe Insulation Co Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability case was filed by Claudia Mcelroy against Thorpe Insulation Co in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6612

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Alexander Williams, Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Coffia Lauvencia

Manasco Jeanice

Mcelroy Claudia

Mcelroy Donald

Mcelroy Harlan

Mcelroy Jeanette

Mcelroy Vernon

Defendants

A.P. Green Industries Inc.

Ac&s Inc.

Chevron Usa Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2002
  • Decl & Ord for Ref of Jury Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (Complaint as to defendant Combus- tion Engineering Inc ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2002
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/O PREJ. (ENTIRE ACTION) ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2002
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice; Complaint as to Chevron U S A Inc ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2002
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT RILEY STOKER CORPO RATION AND ITS DIVISIONS SUBSIDARI ES AND RELATED COMPANIES ONLY. EA CH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2002
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • Notice-Stay Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (With prejudice, As to Defendant Shell Oil Company ONLY. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • Notice (of pendency of bankruptcy and automatic stay ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • Notice (of pendency of bankruptcy and automatice stay ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2001
  • Notice (OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2001
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Amendment to Complaint (Doe I to be Dresser Industries, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2001
  • Notice of Status Conference filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.