This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 15:25:55 (UTC).

CLARENCE CLEGG III VS ANNETTE RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 10/11/2006 CLARENCE CLEGG III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANNETTE RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, GRETCHEN W., GOLDBERG, HANK M, BURDGE, RICHARD J., TAYLOR, GRETCHEN, GOLDBERG, HANK M., DIESMAN, KATHLEEN O. and HALEVY, LOUISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4271

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TAYLOR, GRETCHEN W.

GOLDBERG, HANK M

BURDGE, RICHARD J.

TAYLOR, GRETCHEN

GOLDBERG, HANK M.

DIESMAN, KATHLEEN O.

HALEVY, LOUISE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEGG CLARENCE

Respondent

RAMIREZ ANNETTE

Other

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AGUIRRE RUDY

Respondent Attorney

MACDOWELL ELIZABETH LILLIAN

Other Attorneys

ALEXANDRA MARTINA BAUER

BAUER ALEXANDRA M.

 

Court Documents

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

5/31/2018: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

Order - After Hearing

5/31/2018: Order - After Hearing

Proof of Service - Mail

5/18/2018: Proof of Service - Mail

Request - Telephonic Appearance

5/9/2018: Request - Telephonic Appearance

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

5/9/2018: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/9/2018: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) - -Child Support

3/14/2018: DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) - -Child Support

Proof of Service - Mail

11/13/2017: Proof of Service - Mail

DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 - Substitution of Payee

10/12/2017: DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 - Substitution of Payee

Case File - Public

5/22/2017: Case File - Public

Proof of Service - Mail

5/18/2017: Proof of Service - Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Department 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding; DSU - MTN (Modification Hearing) - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketOrder - After Hearing; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketRequest - Telephonic Appearance; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) (-Child Support ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2006
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ramirez, Annette ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ramirez, Annette ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ramirez, Annette ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • DocketResponse (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ramirez, Annette ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ramirez, Annette ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (Summons - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clegg, Clarence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clegg, Clarence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clegg, Clarence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation (12-19-06 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clegg, Clarence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clegg, Clarence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAUER ALEXANDRA M.