This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 21:56:55 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MANCHESTER MAINE CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/08/2003 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MANCHESTER MAINE CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRUCE MITCHELL and HALEY J. FROMHOLZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5353

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRUCE MITCHELL

HALEY J. FROMHOLZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

A.B.C. MARKET CORP.

ABC MARKET CORP

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

F4L FOOD CO.

KIM BANG JA

KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC

MANCHESTER MAINE CORP.

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

PDK CORPORATION

ROYAL MONKEY ENTERPRISES INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TELEPHONE COMPANY

SUPER BARGAIN MARKET

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DELGADILLO ROCKARD J. CITY ATTORNEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SAKAMOTO SANDRA L.

CUMMINGS CHARLES D. ESQ.

COLLINS CRAIG M. LAW OFFICES OF

GRAHAM ARNOLD K. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2004
  • DocketOrder (FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2004
  • DocketStipulation (for entry of final order of condemnation ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUST COMPENSATION PAID PURSUANT TO JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUST COMPENSATION PAID PURSUANT TO JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 20, Haley J. Fromholz, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL OF SBC) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketStipulation (For Entry of Judgment ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketJudgment (In Condemnation ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • DocketStipulation and Order (For Withdrawal of Deposit of Probable Compensation ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2004
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 20, Haley J. Fromholz, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketList of Witnesses; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2003
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2003
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2003
  • DocketNotice (Of Deposit ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2003
  • DocketOrder (TO ASSESSOR FOR CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2003
  • DocketOrder (PERMITTING DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2003
  • DocketOrder (FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern California Telephone Company is a litigant

Latest cases where KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant