This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2016 at 02:47:34 (UTC).

Carlos G Calderon Vs Ana B Calderon

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Carlos G Calderon against Ana B Calderon in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1660

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Calderon Carlos G

Respondent

Calderon Ana B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2008
  • Declaration-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Stipulation-Waive Service Dec Disc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Stipulation, Appearance & Waivers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP (Judgment package filed and entered on 01/25/08 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP (Judgment package rejected and mail ed on 11/06/07 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • Agreement-Conciliation Crt-& Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • Order-Waiver Court Fees & Cost Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.