This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2015 21:24:11

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 01/21/2005 a Property - Other Property Fraud case was filed by Brian Vartanian against Alfred Paul Seckel in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX0170
  • Filing Date 01/21/2005
  • Case Status Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type Property - Other Property Fraud
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge Charles W. Stoll
  • Courthouse Glendale Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Vartanian Brian
  • Represented By
    • Mckay Mitch S.
  • Defendant Seckel Alfred Paul
  • Represented By
    • Law Offices Of Nicholas B. Spirtos
    • Law Offices Of Robert J. Allan & Assoc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • Decl & Ord for Refund of Jury Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 05/16/2006
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 01/27/2006
  • Notice (OF TRIAL & FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 01/26/2006
  • Notice Filed by Clerk
  • 01/25/2006
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 12/16/2005
  • Order (granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 12/13/2005
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 11/17/2005
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEDIATION DID NOT TAKE PLACE. DEFENDANTS COUNSEL SEEKING RELIEF AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Mediator
  • 11/08/2005
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 11/08/2005
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 10/20/2005
  • Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator
  • 09/28/2005
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk
  • 09/19/2005
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 09/16/2005
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 09/09/2005
  • Stipulation (TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALFRED PAUL SECKEL AKA AL SECKEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 08/24/2005
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 08/04/2005
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATIONS OF ALFRED P. SECKEL AND TERI E. KIRKWOOD, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 06/09/2005
  • Default Judgment (BY CLERK ENTERED THIS DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/09/2005
  • Declaration (OF MITCH S. MCKAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/09/2005
  • Request for Entry of Default (AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.